CA SB809 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10149 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 19402 of the Elections Code, and to add Article 5.1 (commencing with Section 8589.71) to Chapter 7 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Chapters 12 (commencing with Section 8870), 12.1 (commencing with Section 8871), and Chapters 14 (commencing with Section 8899.10) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB809 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-01-13SenateRead first time.
2020-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback