CA SB808 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66282 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State University: annual report: sexual harassment reports: formal sexual harassment complaints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB808 Dodd (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - Assembly - SB 808 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB808 Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-01SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-08-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-08-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2802.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-08-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2023-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-08SenateMay 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 25).
2023-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2023-03-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 571.) (March 29).
2023-03-08SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66282New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback