CA SB808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2020.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Set for hearing June 12. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From printer. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | To print. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB808 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB808 |