CA SB808 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


An act to amend Sections 47604.33, 47604.5, 47605, 47605.1, 47607, 47613, and 47651 of, to add Section 47605.9 to, and to repeal Sections 47605.5, 47605.6, 47605.8, and 47607.5 of, the Education Code, relating to charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Charter schools: chartering authorities and approvals.



2018-02-01SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2017-04-26SenateApril 26 set for second hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2017-04-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-13SenateApril 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

California State Sources

Bill Comments