CA SB807 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8609, 8610, and 8621 of, to add Section 8621.5 to, to repeal Sections 8637 and 8921 of, and to repeal Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 8623 of Part 2 of Division 13 of, the Family Code, relating to adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption facilitators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB807 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-05AssemblyJuly 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom consent calendar on motion of Senator Ochoa Bogh.
2023-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2023-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2023-05-04SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2023-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 896.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2023-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code8609Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code8610Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code8621Amended CodeCitation Text
Family Code8621.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Family Code8637Repealed CodeCitation Text
Family Code8921Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback