CA SB806 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 125.3, 801.01, 2001, 2020, 2021, 2064.5, 2065, 2081, 2096, 2111, 2112, 2113, 2168, 2168.4, 2228.1, 2273, 2424, 2435, 2443, 2450, 2454.5, 2460, 2520, 2529, 2529.5, 3504, 3509, 3510, 3512, 3517, 3519, 3519.5, 3524, 3527, 3530, 3533, and 3577 of, to add Sections 2097, 2220.01, 2227.3, 2511.5, 2519.5, and 3575.5 to, and to repeal Sections 2228.5, 3521.5, and 3546 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 806 Roth Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB806 Roth Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB806 Roth (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 2623.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3126.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-09-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-06-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-05-28SenateRead third time and amended.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-04SenateMay 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 841.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code125.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2001Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2020Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2021Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2064.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2065Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2081Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2096Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2097New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2111Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2112Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2113Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2168Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2168.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2220.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2227.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2228.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2228.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2273Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2424Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2435Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2443Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2450Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2454.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2460Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2511.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2519.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2520Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2529Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2529.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3504Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3509Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3510Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3512Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3517Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3519Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3519.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3521.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3524Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3527Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3530Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3533Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3546Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3575.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code3577Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code801.01Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806#92CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB806

Bill Comments

feedback