CA SB806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 2750.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Worker status: employees: independent contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-14-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |