CA SB803 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7303, 7313, 7314.3, 7316, 7320, 7331, 7334, 7338, 7347, 7354, 7355, 7356, 7357, 7362, 7362.5, 7364, 7365, 7389.5, 7395.1, 7401, 7407, and 7423 of, to add Sections 7322 and 7363 to, and to repeal Sections 7303.2, 7337.5, 7353, and 7402 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbering and cosmetology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB803 Roth Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 803 Roth Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB803 Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2021-09-03SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-02SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (July 14).
2021-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1418.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-26SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-05-26SenateFrom special consent calendar on motion of Senator Wilk.
2021-05-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20).
2021-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-17SenateMay 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-05-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-07SenateSet for hearing May 17.
2021-05-04SenateMay 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-27SenateMay 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 841.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7303Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7303.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7313Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7314.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7316Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7320Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7322New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7331Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7334Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7337.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7338Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7347Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7353Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7354Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7355Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7356Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7357Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7362Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7362.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7363New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7364Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7365Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7389.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7395.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7401Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7402Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7407Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7423Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback