CA SB802 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 38751 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emerging vehicle technology: advisory study group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB802 Skinner et al (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2017-07-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
2017-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1212.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-11SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 751.) (April 18).
2017-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 19 in EQ. pending receipt.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2017-03-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code38750Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38751New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback