CA SB801 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 972 of, and to add Sections 2104.7, 2836.7, 9616, and 9618 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Aliso Canyon natural gas storage facility: electrical grid data: electricity demand reduction and response: energy storage solutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB801 Stern Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 801 Stern Senate Third Reading By DABABNEH (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB801 Stern Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 801 Stern Senate Third Reading By DABABNEH (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB801 Stern Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 3220.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1399.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 807.) (April 24). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2104.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2836.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 353.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 849.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9616 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9618 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 972 | Amended Code | Citation Text |