CA SB800 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28, 146, 500, 650.2, 800, 1603a, 1618.5, 1640.1, 1648.10, 1650, 1695, 1695.1, 1905.1, 1944, 2054, 2401, 2428, 2529, 2650, 2770, 2770.1, 2770.2, 2770.7, 2770.8, 2770.10, 2770.11, 2770.12, 2770.13, 2835.5, 3057, 3509.5, 4836.2, 4887, 4938, 4939, 4980.399, 4980.43, 4980.54, 4984.01, 4989.34, 4992.09, 4996.2, 4996.22, 4996.28, 4999.1, 4999.2, 4999.3, 4999.4, 4999.5, 4999.7, 4999.45, 4999.46, 4999.55, 4999.76, and 4999.100 of, to amend the heading of Article 3.1 (commencing with Section 2770) of Chapter 6 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 1917.2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB800 Committee On B.P.&E.D. (Hill) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 800 B. P.& E.D. Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB800 Committee On B.P.&E.D. (Hill) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 800 B. P.& E.D. Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB800 Committee On B.P.&E.D. (Hill) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2955.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 18. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |