CA SB8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.9D (commencing with Section 1001.82) to Title 6 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diversion: mental disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB8 Beall et al (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 1279.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-04-03SenateApril 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-24SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1001.82New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback