CA SB797 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 653, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.95 (commencing with Section 7286.65) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board: transactions and use tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB797 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - SB 797 Hill Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB797 Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 653, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-15SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2689.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-07SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 2594.)
2017-09-05SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2454.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2017-09-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2017-09-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-09-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-07-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 12).
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1337.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-03-31SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback