CA SB795 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1031 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 384a, 849, and 4504 of, and to amend and renumber Section 4131.5 of, the Penal Code, to amend Section 5008 of the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Section 1403 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety.
Title
Public Safety Omnibus.
Sponsors
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent #9 SB795 Committee On PUB. S. (Hancock) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 795 PUB. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB795 Committee On PUB. S. (Hancock) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - SB 795 PUB. S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB795 Committee On PUB. S. (Hancock) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2379.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2639.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1160.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 824.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 10. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 17). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 384 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 849 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1403 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |