CA SB793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 104559.5) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flavored tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB793 Hill et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 793 Hill Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB793 Hill et al (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2020.
2020-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2020-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:45 p.m.
2020-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4386.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 5168.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 5167.)
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (August 4).
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 3846.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3765.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3533.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2020-05-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-03-17SenateApril 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-01-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6.
2020-01-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code104559.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback