CA SB792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8258 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless Coordinating and Financing Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB792 Wilk et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-05-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and HEALTH.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1336.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 885.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53997.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8258New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback