CA SB791 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 87604.5, 89521, and 92612.1 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education: academic and administrative employees: disclosure of sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB791 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - SB 791 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB791 McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2818.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3385.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1361.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2023-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2023-04-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 683.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 12.
2023-03-29SenateRe-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2023-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code87604.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code89521New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code92612.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback