CA SB791 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 17 (commencing with Section 54900) to Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to land use.
Title
California Surplus Land Unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 791 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB791 Cortese et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB791 Cortese (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB791 Cortese et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB791 Cortese (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2622.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 3125.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 1394.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1204.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 987.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and G.O. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 54900 | New Code | See Bill Text |