CA SB791 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 441 of, to amend and add Section 1152 of, to add Sections 1153.5 and 1157 to, and to repeal Section 1153 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: valuation: certificated aircraft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 791 GOV.& F. Third Reading Urgency By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB791 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3175.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-14AssemblyAugust 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01AssemblyJuly 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1109.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1152New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1153Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code441Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback