CA SB790 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18622.5 and 19311 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income taxes: partnerships: audit adjustments: elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB790 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 790 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB790 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-27SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-06-17AssemblyJune 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21.
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18622.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19311Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback