CA SB790 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 117 (commencing with Section 150300) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care providers: gifts and benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB790 McGuire et al (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1107.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 887.) (April 26).
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2190Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code870New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code150300New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback