CA SB79 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2006.3 and 2006.4 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to county roads, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County road commissioner: Counties of Colusa and Glenn.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB79 Nielsen Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Assembly - SB 79 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB79 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Assembly - SB 79 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB79 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1576.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 941.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS. |
2021-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2006.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2006.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |