CA SB789 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 21168.6.7 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: sports and entertainment project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - SB 789 Newman Senate Third Reading Amend By GIPSON Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB789 Newman et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-09-08AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-09-08AssemblySeptember 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted.
2017-09-07AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 2999.)
2017-09-05AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES., L. GOV., and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-01AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-08-29AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-29AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2017-08-28AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-06-29AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
2017-06-29AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
2017-06-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2017-06-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-04-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 799.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 626.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code3073.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21080Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21168.6.7Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback