CA SB788 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4663 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: risk factors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB788 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 788 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB788 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - SB 788 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB788 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-09-28 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2383.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2211.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1381.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1204.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4663 | Amended Code | Citation Text |