CA SB788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 257, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 257, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23080, 23090.5, 25503.4, 25503.56, and 25503.57 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: appeals: decision: tied-house restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 788 G.O. Third Reading Urgency By BIGELOW (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB788 G.O. (Dodd) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB788 G.O. (Dodd) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 257, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2812.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1157.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 773.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23090.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |