CA SB786 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 103526.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to blockchain technology.
Title
County birth, death, and marriage records: blockchain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 786 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Calderon (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB786 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Becker (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB786 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB786 Becker (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 704, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1046.) (May 6). |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103526.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |