CA SB786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 803.1, 1902, 1902.1, 1902.2, 1902.3, 1903, 1904, 1905, 1905.1, 1905.2, 1906, 1909, 1910.5, 1916, 1917, 1917.1, 1917.3, 1918, 1922, 1926.1, 1926.2, 1926.3, 1926.4, 1930, 1931, 1932, 1934, 1935, 1936, 1936.1, 1940, 1941, 1941.5, 1942, 1943, 1944, 1947, 1949, 1950, 1950.5, 1951, 1952, 1955, 1957, 1958, 1958.1, 1962, 1963, 1964, 1966, 1966.1, 1966.2, 1966.4, 1966.5, 1966.6, 2234, 4980.36, 4980.37, 4980.43.4, 4980.50, 4980.81, 4989.22, 4990.30, 4992.1, 4996.23.3, 4999.32, 4999.33, 4999.46.4, and 4999.52 of, to repeal Section 4980.395 of, to repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 2155) and Article 11 (commencing with Section 2200) of Chapter 5 of Division 2 of, and to repeal and add Sections 2940 and 2941 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB786 B.P.&E.D. (Glazer) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 786 B., P. & E.D. Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB786 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2844.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3255.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-03-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11.
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code1902Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1902.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1903Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1904Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1905.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1906Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1909Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1910.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1916Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1917.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1918Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1922Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1926.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1930Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1931Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1932Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1934Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1935Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1936Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1936.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1940Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1941Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1941.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1942Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1943Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1944Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1947Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1949Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1950Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1950.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1951Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1952Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1955Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1957Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1958Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1958.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1962Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1963Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1964Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1966.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2234Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2940New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2941New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code4980.36Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.37Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.395Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.43.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4980.81Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4989.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4990.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4992.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4996.23.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.33Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.46.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4999.52Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code803.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback