CA SB786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 803.1, 1902, 1902.1, 1902.2, 1902.3, 1903, 1904, 1905, 1905.1, 1905.2, 1906, 1909, 1910.5, 1916, 1917, 1917.1, 1917.3, 1918, 1922, 1926.1, 1926.2, 1926.3, 1926.4, 1930, 1931, 1932, 1934, 1935, 1936, 1936.1, 1940, 1941, 1941.5, 1942, 1943, 1944, 1947, 1949, 1950, 1950.5, 1951, 1952, 1955, 1957, 1958, 1958.1, 1962, 1963, 1964, 1966, 1966.1, 1966.2, 1966.4, 1966.5, 1966.6, 2234, 4980.36, 4980.37, 4980.43.4, 4980.50, 4980.81, 4989.22, 4990.30, 4992.1, 4996.23.3, 4999.32, 4999.33, 4999.46.4, and 4999.52 of, to repeal Section 4980.395 of, to repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 2155) and Article 11 (commencing with Section 2200) of Chapter 5 of Division 2 of, and to repeal and add Sections 2940 and 2941 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB786 B.P.&E.D. (Glazer) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 786 B., P. & E.D. Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB786 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 786 B., P. & E.D. Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB786 B.P.&E.D (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2844.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3255.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |