CA SB785 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 351.3 and 351.4 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Evidence: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB785 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - SB 785 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB785 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - SB 785 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB785 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-05-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5006.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4940.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | March 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2114.) (July 18). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Set for hearing July 18. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1093.) (May 16). |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1760.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1760.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Evidence Code | 351.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 351.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Evidence Code | 351.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |