CA SB783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7514.8 to the Government Code, relating to pension fund divestments, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employee pension funds: divestment proposals: review.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB783 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB783 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | June 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19849.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 7514.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |