CA SB782 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6508.2, 20057, 20161, 20430, 20444, 20630, 20636, 20636.1, 20691, 20963, 20965, 21464, 21482, 21710, 22850, 22852, 22866, 22910, 22911, 22913, 22946, 75071, 75109.1, and 75611.5 of, to repeal Section 20837 of, and to repeal and add Section 20963.5 of, the Government Code, relating to public retirement systems, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ and judges’ retirement: administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB782 L., P.E. & R. (Hill) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 782 L., P.E. & R. Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB782 L., P.E. & R (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-04SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-08-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-03-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 7.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20057Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20161Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20430Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20444Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20630Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20636Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20636.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20691Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20837Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code20963Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20963.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20965Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21464Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21482Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21710Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22850Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22852Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22866Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22910Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22911Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22913Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22946Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6508.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75071Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75109.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75611.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback