CA SB782 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 25402.10 of, and to add Section 25402.14 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 8380 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy data transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB782 Skinner et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 27).
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-05-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 2 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1190.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 26).
2017-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-07SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-04-05SenateRe-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and ED.
2017-03-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback