CA SB780 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 915, 946.4, 960.2, 960.8, 16186, 24011, 25350.51, 26909, 27361.3, 31000.9, 53051, and 65589.4 of, and to repeal Section 51256.1 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 20145 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Section 5786.7 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 72 and 97.70 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to repeal Section 31031.5 of the Water Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local Government Omnibus Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB780 GOV. & F. (McGuire) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 780 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB780 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SB 780 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB780 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 329, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2529.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2911.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 31. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 24011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 25350.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 26909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27361.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31000.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51256.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65589.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 946.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 960.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 960.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5786.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 97.70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 31031.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |