CA SB78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 100502, 100506, 100506.1, 100506.2, 100506.4, 100506.5, and 100520 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 12803 of, to add Title 24 (commencing with Section 100700) to, and to add and repeal Title 25 (commencing with Section 100800) of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 1272, 1365, 1399.849, 124130, and 130062 of, to add Sections 1345.5, 1367.0085, 120511, 120512, 120780.5, 120780.6, 122440, and 122441 to, to add Part 1.5 (commencing with Section 438) to Division 1 of, to add Chapter 6.2 (commencing with Section 120973) to Part 4 of Division 105 of, and to repeal and add Section 120525 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 10273.6 and 10965.3 of, and to add Section 10112.296 to, the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 3208.3 and 3351 of, and to add Sections 3370.1 and 3371.1 to, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 19254, 19291, 19521, and 19533 of, to add Sections 17141.1 and 19548.8 to, and to add Part 32 (commencing with Section 61000) to Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 4316 and 14131.10 of, to add Sections 4317.5, 7281.1, 14021.37, 14104.36, 14105.36, and 14190 to, and to add Article 5.8 (commencing with Section 14188) and Article 6.8 (commencing with Section 14199.60) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 52 of Chapter 18 of the Statutes of 2015, relating to health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 78 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB78 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB78 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-06-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1724.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2397.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 2390.)
2019-06-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-24AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100502Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100506Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100506.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100506.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100506.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100506.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100520Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12803New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120511New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120512New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120780.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code120780.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122440New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code122441New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code124130Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1272Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code130062Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1345.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1365Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1367.0085New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1399.849Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10112.296New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10273.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10965.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3351Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3370.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code3371.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17141.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19254Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19291Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19521Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19533Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19548.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14021.37New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14104.36New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14105.36New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14131.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14190New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4316Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code4317.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code7281.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback