CA SB778 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - June 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.)
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - June 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.)
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3501 of, and to add Section 3503.1 to, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Buy Clean California Act: Environmental Product Declarations: concrete.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB778 Becker (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB778 Becker (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Assembly | June 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.) |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 1128.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 987.) (April 29). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 814.) (April 15). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 3501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 3503.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |