CA SB777 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 42283.7 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: reusable grocery bags and recycled paper bags.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-14 - Assembly - SB 777 Allen Senate Third Reading By Friedman (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB777 Allen Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB777 Allen (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateVeto sustained.
2024-01-25SenateStricken from file.
2023-10-08SenateIn Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2023-10-08SenateVetoed by the Governor.
2023-09-21 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2829.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-09-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 3519.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-07AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2023-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2023-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-07-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2023-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-06-19AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1183.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-17SenateApril 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2023-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 572.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 29.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42283.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777#93ENR
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB777

Bill Comments

feedback