CA SB776 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11352 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 116340, 116385, 116766, and 116767 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 6.7 (commencing with Section 13490) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Safe drinking water and water quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB776 Gonzalez Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 776 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB776 Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 776 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB776 Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2379.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1204.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 937.) (April 27). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 757.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q., JUD., and PUB. S. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116766 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116767 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 13490 | New Code | See Bill Text |