CA SB776 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Set for hearing January 21.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 21 Senate Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66024.5 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College admissions: criminal history inquiry: prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 15.
2020-01-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66024.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback