CA SB775 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 27906.7 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: zero-emission schoolbuses: signage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB775 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-24 - Assembly - SB 775 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB775 Padilla (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2593.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2023-09-06SenateOrdered to unfinished business.
2023-09-06SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Padilla.
2023-08-28SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Padilla.
2023-08-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2023-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2802.) Ordered to the Senate.
2023-08-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2023-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2023-07-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-05-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1204.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-04-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 635.) (April 10).
2023-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 580.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-07SenateSet for hearing March 28.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2023-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code27906.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback