CA SB774 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-05 - July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-05 - July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8386 of, and to add Section 8373 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: microgrids.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB774 Stern (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Assembly | July 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1244.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 843.) (April 24). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8373 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |