CA SB772 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - April 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 125.9 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations: citations: minor violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateApril 19 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2021-03-15SenateMarch 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code125.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback