CA SB771 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 125055 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Prenatal screening program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB771 Becker (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB771 Becker (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1203.) (May 20). |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1046.) (May 6). |
2021-05-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 125055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |