CA SB771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21098.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: continuing education: public employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB771 De León (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB771 De León (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 537.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21098.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |