CA SB770 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14902.5 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to commercial feed.
Title
Department of Food and Agriculture: medicated feed.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 770 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB770 Mendoza (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB770 Mendoza (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 806, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 882.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14902.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |