CA SB77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 66021.2, 66749.6, 66749.7, 68075.7, 68130.7, 69432, 69434, 69434.5, 69435, 69437, 69437.6, 69508.5, 70023, 76396.2, 76396.3, 78042, 81130.5, 84750.4, and 92010 of, to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 69438) and Article 9 (commencing with Section 69465) to Chapter 1.7 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to add Article 19.5 (commencing with Section 69996) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 70115) to Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of, to add Chapter 4.4 (commencing with Section 89420) to Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of, to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 89775) to Chapter 6 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 92665) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, and to add and repeal Section 66021.9 of, the Education Code, to amend Sections 22956, 22959.83, and 68926.3 of, and to add Sections 22874.8 and 22958.5 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 13 of Chapter 624 of the Statutes of 2012, and to amend the Budget Act of 2018 (Chapters 29 and 30 of the Statutes of 2018) by amending Items 6870-101-0001 and 6870-107-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 77 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB77 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB77 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-25SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-06-17SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1596.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 2300.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66021.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66021.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code66749.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66749.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68075.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68130.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69432Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69434.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69435Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69437Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69437.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69438New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code69465New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code69508.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code70023Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code76396.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code76396.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78042Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code81130.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84750.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code92010Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22874.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code22956Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code22958.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code22959.83Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68926.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback