CA SB769 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.4.6 (commencing with Section 53238) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: fiscal and financial training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Gonzalez (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Gonzalez (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21). |
2023-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1220.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1183.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 796.) (April 19). |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53238 | New Code | See Bill Text |