CA SB769 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-01 - September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 78041, 78042, and 78043 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baccalaureate Degree Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB769 Hill et al (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01AssemblySeptember 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (July 11).
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 1335.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1190.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 26.
2017-04-04SenateApril 5 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 5.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78040Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78041Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78042Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code78043Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback