CA SB767 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5090.42 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.
Title
Off-highway vehicular recreation: Carnegie State Vehicular Recreation Area: Alameda-Tesla Expansion Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB767 Glazer et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB767 Glazer et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Result (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and A. & A.R. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 773.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 623.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5090.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |