CA SB767 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - January 9 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jan 9 @ 1:30 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13956 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 16501.35 of, and to add Section 16012 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to sexually exploited children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually exploited children: foster care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-01SenateJanuary 9 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-11-16SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2017-05-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-03-27SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13956Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16012New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16501.35Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback