CA SB767 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 580, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 580, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130350.5 of, to add Section 130350.7 to, and to repeal Section 130350.6 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB767 De Le (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 767 De Leon Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB767 De Le (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 767 De Leon Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB767 De Le (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 580, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2754.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3104.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 726.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130350.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 130350.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 130350.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |